Budget and Finance Committee
Charge
精东传媒
Works with the Core Board and Executive Director on financial planning and reporting. The Chair of the committee serves on the Board of Directors.
Roster
Don Perry Allgeier
(Chair, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Ms. Megan Heady
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2025)
Alice Daugherty
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Mr. Leland Deeds
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Jill Dixon
(Member, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Julie E. Griffin
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Ms. Lydia Harlan
(Member, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Ms. Maris L. Hayashi
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Mr. Rodney E. Lippard
(Member, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Mr. Matt J. McLain
(Member, July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2025)
Jennie Murray
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Allyson Rodriguez
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Mary Rzepczynski
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Jonathan Paul Shank
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Joseph Yue
(Member, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2026)
Miranda Henry Bennett
(Board Liaison, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2025)
Thomas Ferren
(Staff Liaison, August 20, 2024, to August 21, 2099)
Julie Reese
(Staff Liaison, July 1, 2024, to June 30, 2030)
Displaying active committee roster as of 09/18/2024. Last retrieved on 09/18/2024. Refresh now.
Resources
About this Committee
精东传媒
Deliverables
- Annual budget
- Budget analysis and fiscal planning on behalf of the Board
- Review and recommendation of Core funding requests
- Represent Core at 精东传媒budget meetings
Expected Time Commitment
- Holds 4-6 virtual meetings with per year
Desired Skills, Knowledge, and Experience
- Interest or knowledge of budget development and financial planning