Mr. Ben Goldman
(Co-Chair, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Kate Hutchens
(Co-Chair, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mrs. Colleen W. Barrett
(Member, July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Richenda Lea Brim
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Sarah Burke Cahalan
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Rachel L. Cohen
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Abigail B. Connick
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Rosemary K. J. Davis
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Elizabeth B. DeBold
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Diane H. Dias De Fazio
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Moira Fitzgerald
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Dr. Anna Franz
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Margaret Hagerty Gamm
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Julie Grob
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Elspeth Healey
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Elizabeth Hobart
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Erika L. Jenns
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Elizabeth Joffrion
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Alexander Clark Johnston
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Juli McLoone
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mr. Joel Warren Minor
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mr. Robert D. Montoya
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Gina M. Nortonsmith
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Jessica M. Pigza
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Leah Richardson
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mr. Gregory Schmidt
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Edwin C. Schroeder
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Gregory Kevin Seppi
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Jillian Sparks
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Jay Sylvestre
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Tory Ondrla
(Staff Liaison, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2018. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.